Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Nesvig, Pam Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $12,209.39Creditor: Corey SchumacherDebtor: Kelly Glatt (ActiveEntered: 10/10/2017Docketed: 10/10/2017, 2:08 PMDamages: $12,209.39Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 6 Issued Issued |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 5 | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 4 Small Claims Served Small Claims Served |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Small Claims No Service Notice Filed Index # 3 | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 1 Affidavit of Identification Affidavit of Identification |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 2 Claim Affidavit - Kelly Glatt Claim Affidavit - Kelly Glatt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.