Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Goter, Wayne D Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $403.30Creditor: North Central Grain CooperativeDebtor: Melissa K Frenzel (ActiveAssignee: First Collections Inc.Entered: 09/21/2017Docketed: 09/21/2017, 3:07 PMDamages: $403.30Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment Index # 12 of Judgment from North Central Grain Cooperative to First Collections of Judgment from North Central Grain Cooperative to First Collections |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 11 | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Service Service |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 7 Statement of Cost Statement of Cost |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Served Index # 8 Affidavit of Service - Frenzel Affidavit of Service - Frenzel |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 10 Statement of Cost Statement of Cost |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Dishonored Check & Final Demand for Payment Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Dishonored Check & Final Demand for Payment |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 1 Claim Affidavit FRENZEL Claim Affidavit FRENZEL |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 5 Notice of Dishonored Check & Final Demand for Payment Notice of Dishonored Check & Final Demand for Payment |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 3 Proof of Debt NSF Checks Proof of Debt NSF Checks |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.