Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Goter, Wayne D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 19 | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 18 and Memorandum and Memorandum |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goter, Wayne D) Result: Hearing Ended | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Levi and Brianna Wetzel Levi and Brianna Wetzel |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 16 Notice of Nonappearance Notice of Nonappearance |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 15 Small Claims Small Claims |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 14 Small Claims - 2 hours Small Claims - 2 hours |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Levi and Brianna Wetzel Levi and Brianna Wetzel |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 13 Exhibit A to Aff of VanHal - Cement Exhibit A to Aff of VanHal - Cement |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit of Travis L. VanHal Affidavit of Travis L. VanHal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.