Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Feland, Cynthia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing Dismissed CANCELED Civil Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Feland, Cynthia) Dismissed - Partition Hearing 09/25/2018 Continued to 01/30/2019 - Continuance - Stipulation and Order Filed - Bernhardt, James; Nelson, Randall; Nelson, Richard 01/30/2019 Reset by Court to 01/30/2019 |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 67 Proposed Order of Dismissal - Attorney Arendt Proposed Order of Dismissal - Attorney Arendt |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 68 Affidavit of Service - Smith and Nelson Affidavit of Service - Smith and Nelson |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 69 of Dismissal - Attorney Arendt of Dismissal - Attorney Arendt |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 66 Stipulation for Dismissal Stipulation for Dismissal |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 65 of Case Settlement of Case Settlement |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 63 Notice of Case Settlement Notice of Case Settlement |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 64 Affidavit of Service - Smith and Nelson Affidavit of Service - Smith and Nelson |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 54 Exhibit C-Affidavit of James Bernhardt Exhibit C-Affidavit of James Bernhardt |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 62 Certificate of Service to David Smith, Ian Arendt, and Richard Nelson Certificate of Service to David Smith, Ian Arendt, and Richard Nelson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.