Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 16 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Notice of Substitution of Counsel |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Rachael and Justin Hankin Rachael and Justin Hankin |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 12 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Rachael and Justin Hankin Rachael and Justin Hankin |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 9 | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 8 Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order For Judgment Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order For Judgment |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Of Identification And Non-Military Status Of Identification And Non-Military Status |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Of Default Of Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.