Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Hagerty, Gail Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $725.27Creditor: AR Audit Services IncDebtor: Elias Nagel (ActiveEntered: 08/10/2017Docketed: 08/10/2017, 8:59 AMDamages: $725.27Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 16 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Notice of Substitution of Counsel |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Elias Nagel Elias Nagel |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Elias Nagel Elias Nagel |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 14 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 11 of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 12 | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 13 | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 Affidavit of Verification, Amount due and Assignment Affidavit of Verification, Amount due and Assignment |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Judgment Attorney Laura Ringsak Judgment Attorney Laura Ringsak |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.