Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Hagerty, Gail Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: DISCOVER BANKDebtor: DALTON KOROPATNICKI (ActiveEntered: 08/31/2017Docketed: 08/31/2017, 3:07 PMDamages: $4,686.54Current Costs Due: 03/16/2018, Execution, $10.0007/20/2018, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 19 Full Satisfaction of Judgment against DALTON KOROPATNICKI Full Satisfaction of Judgment against DALTON KOROPATNICKI |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 18 Writ of Execution returned Writ of Execution returned |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 17 Issued Issued |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 16 Returned Returned |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 15 - Original - out for Service - Original - out for Service |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Certificate of Service (DALTON KOROPATNICKI) Certificate of Service (DALTON KOROPATNICKI) |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 13 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 11 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 12 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 10 DALTON KOROPATNICKI DALTON KOROPATNICKI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.