Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2017 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 22 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Notice of Substitution of Counsel |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Stacey Peterson Stacey Peterson |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Stacey Peterson Stacey Peterson |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 16 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 11 Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements Attorney Laura Ringsak Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements Attorney Laura Ringsak |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.