Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2017 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 25 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 23 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Notice of Substitution of Counsel |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 24 Kaylee and Tony Nies Kaylee and Tony Nies |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 21 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 22 Kaylee and Tony Nies Kaylee and Tony Nies |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 18 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Tony Nies Tony Nies |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 20 | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 19 | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Index # 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.