Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinson, Sylvia I, Waters, Brian F, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Wellsfry, Marilyn M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Thomas W. Kelly presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management98 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2006 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Time To Trial80 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
|
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Notice Date: 2006-12-08 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 947 - VACATED;SETTLED AT 01/18/07 MSC Disp Clerk: BMW Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information SIGNED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT;ENCLOSED WITH MSC JUDICIAL NOTES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMW |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - CIVIL Desc2: **RESET FROM 12/21/06** Disp Code: 365 - SETTLED AT MSC;TDS VACATED Disp Clerk: BMW Filing Clerk: BMW Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF RESCHEDULING Desc2: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Desc3: 12/18/06 AT 8:30 AM Notice Date: 2006-12-19 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 996 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: BMW Filing Clerk: BMW Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - CIVIL Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CAL/RESET JUDICIAL UNAVAILIBILITY Disp Clerk: BMW Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMW |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ATTY SCHALLER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAJ |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ATTTY MIESKE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAJ |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING COURT TRIAL PROCEDURES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE-SET COURT TRIAL Notice Date: 2006-11-13 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 386 - TRIAL DATE SET Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.