Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mendoza, Gilberto S., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 07, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time144 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order 913520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: STIPULATION AND ORDER [913520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion;C Certified County of Napa vs. Mendoza, Gilberto S. Motion OSC Details: 911270 - Modify Order ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response or Reply 912810-Response/Reply Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service RESPONSE/REPLY [912810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion 912710-Motion Motion/OSC Detail: 911270 - Modify Order Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per MOTION [912710] Motion: MODIFY ORDER [911270] Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant 911140-Fee Waiver Order-Grant Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per FEE WAIVER ORDER-GRANT [911140] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.