Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case in the jurisdiction of Golden Valley County, ND, . Golden Valley County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2023 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGolden Valley County, ND |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Index # 13 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 13 | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 12 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application Index # 9 Application for Default Judgment Application for Default Judgment |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 10 Brief in Support of Application for Default Judgment Brief in Support of Application for Default Judgment |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit of Default Judgment Affidavit of Default Judgment |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 8 Letter from the Court to Atty Haynes re: default judgment Letter from the Court to Atty Haynes re: default judgment |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 6 Findings of Facts, Conclusions of Law and Order for Default Judgment (Proposed) - Haynes Findings of Facts, Conclusions of Law and Order for Default Judgment (Proposed) - Haynes |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 7 Default Judgment (Proposed) - Haynes Default Judgment (Proposed) - Haynes |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Publication - The Golden Valley News - Haynes Affidavit of Publication - The Golden Valley News - Haynes |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Publication - Atty Jami Haynes Affidavit of Publication - Atty Jami Haynes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.