Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Golden Valley County, ND, . Golden Valley County, ND Superior Courts with Ehlis, Rhonda R Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Natalie L Muruato (Inactive: 10/06/2021 - SatisfiedEntered: 09/13/2021Docketed: 09/13/2021, 10:30 AMDamages: $470.00Current Costs Due: 09/13/2021, Costs and Disbursements, $90.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 17 Satisfaction of Judgment - Natalie L Muruato Satisfaction of Judgment - Natalie L Muruato |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 15 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 10 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of 3.2 & Brief - Natalie L Muruato Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of 3.2 & Brief - Natalie L Muruato |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 9 In Support of Motion for Default Judgment In Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 4 Of Default Of Default |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 13 Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 7 Of 3.2 Motion Of 3.2 Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.