Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Golden Valley County, ND, . Golden Valley County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2017 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGolden Valley County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 306 Approving Final Distribution Approving Final Distribution |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 305 Order Approving Final Distribution - Jordan L. Selinger Order Approving Final Distribution - Jordan L. Selinger |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 304 Affidavit of Service - Diane Wehrman, et al Affidavit of Service - Diane Wehrman, et al |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 303 Notice of Proposed Final Distribution Notice of Proposed Final Distribution |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 300 Affidavit of Service - Diane Wehrman, Christopher Nyhus, et al. Affidavit of Service - Diane Wehrman, Christopher Nyhus, et al. |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement Index # 302 Personal Representative's Inventory and Appraisement Personal Representative's Inventory and Appraisement |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Report and Accounting Index # 301 Personal Representative's Final Accounting Personal Representative's Final Accounting |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Dismissed CANCELED Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Greenwood, Dann) Dismissed Judge okayed some appearances by zoom |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 298 Dismissing Petition for Court to Direct Personal Representative to Pursue Debt Owed to the Estate Dismissing Petition for Court to Direct Personal Representative to Pursue Debt Owed to the Estate |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 299 Granting Request to Cancel Hearing Granting Request to Cancel Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.