Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Parenting Responsibility case in the jurisdiction of Foster County, ND, . Foster County, ND Superior Courts with Hovey, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryParenting Responsibility |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFoster County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 34 Notice of State as Real Party in Interest Notice of State as Real Party in Interest |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 35 Service Document - Seth A. Schulz Service Document - Seth A. Schulz |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 36 Service Document - Amy D. Becker Service Document - Amy D. Becker |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Case Settled CANCELED Court Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hovey, James D) Case Settled |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 33 Certificate of Service on Atty Iversen Certificate of Service on Atty Iversen |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 32 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 31 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 30 of Facts, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment of Facts, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 27 Findings of Facts, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment [proposed] - Attorney Krumm Findings of Facts, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment [proposed] - Attorney Krumm |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 28 Judgment [Proposed] - Attorney Krumm Judgment [Proposed] - Attorney Krumm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.