Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Lee, Gary Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Hospital Services IncDebtor: Lucas Quigley (Active, Debtor: Mindy Quigley (ActiveEntered: 03/07/2022Docketed: 03/07/2022, 8:39 AMDamages: $519.83Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Mindy and Lucas Quigley Affidavit of Service by Mail - Mindy and Lucas Quigley |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Full Full |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Declaration of Service by Mail - Mindy and Lucas Quigley Declaration of Service by Mail - Mindy and Lucas Quigley |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 15 | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 16 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 17 on Default on Default |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 14 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Dwelling House served to Mindy Quigley for Lucas Quigley Dwelling House served to Mindy Quigley for Lucas Quigley |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 8 Order of Judgment - Proposed and efiled by Christopher A Carlson Order of Judgment - Proposed and efiled by Christopher A Carlson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.