Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Hagar, Richard L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 43 Order Confirming Sale Order Confirming Sale |
|
December 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 41 Sheriff's Report of Foreclosure Sale Sheriff's Report of Foreclosure Sale |
|
December 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 42 Proposed Order Confirming Sale Filed by Plaintiff via Zachary Nesbit Proposed Order Confirming Sale Filed by Plaintiff via Zachary Nesbit |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 40 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 39 Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Real Estate Sale - All Defendants Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Real Estate Sale - All Defendants |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 38 of Real Estate Sale of Real Estate Sale |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 37 Special Execution (USPS to Attorney) Special Execution (USPS to Attorney) |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Return Not Served Index # 36 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 35 Special Execution (USPS to Attorney) Special Execution (USPS to Attorney) |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 34 Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Entry of Judgment - All Defendants Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Entry of Judgment - All Defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.