Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Cresap, Todd L Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,891.33Creditor: Anita Skutevik, Creditor: Terrance SkutevikDebtor: George Guthrie (ActiveEntered: 03/17/2017Docketed: 03/17/2017, 11:37 AMDamages: $2,891.33Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 5 and Notice of Entry and Notice of Entry |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 4 Proposed Small Claims Judgment Proposed Small Claims Judgment |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Served Index # 3 Sheriff's Return Sheriff's Return |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 1 with Attachments with Attachments |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 2 of Identification with Rental Application of Identification with Rental Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.