Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domiciliary Proceeding case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Mattson, Douglas L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2017 |
CategoryDomiciliary Proceeding |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement Index # 7 Inventory and Appraisement Inventory and Appraisement |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 8 Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 6 for Certified Copy for Certified Copy |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 5 Order of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative Order of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 4 Authenticated probate documents including Last Will and Testament Authenticated probate documents including Last Will and Testament |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 2 Order of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative Order of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Affidavit of Forwarding Copy Affidavit of Forwarding Copy |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 1 Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.