Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Hagar, Richard L Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: LVNV Funding LLCDebtor: Ronald Dignan (ActiveEntered: 03/16/2017Docketed: 03/16/2017, 3:17 PMDamages: $939.63Current Costs Due: 05/18/2017, Execution, $10.0008/14/2017, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 20 Full Satisfaction of Execution Returned Full Satisfaction of Execution Returned |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 21 Against Ronald Dignan Against Ronald Dignan |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 19 Issued Issued |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 18 for Execution for Execution |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 17 Issued Issued |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 16 for Execution for Execution |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Affidavit Of Service By Mail to (Ronald Dignan) Affidavit Of Service By Mail to (Ronald Dignan) |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 12 Notice of Entry of Judgment of Ronald Dignan Notice of Entry of Judgment of Ronald Dignan |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Ronald Dignan Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Ronald Dignan |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 14 Notice of Filing Complaint Notice of Filing Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.