Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mansilla, Cecilio, filed a(n) Other Complaint: Unlimited case represented by Anguiano, Aaron O, Esq., against Abdulla, Ahmed, represented by Lamb &Amp; Michael, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2006 |
CategoryOther Complaint: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.