Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Montague, Akira, filed a(n) General Civil Action case against Kennard, Brenay, in the jurisdiction of Durham County. This case was filed in Durham County Superior Courts Durham Superior Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2024 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Action |
Last RefreshedJune 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDurham County, NC |
|
Filing Court HouseDurham Superior Court |
Amend
Date: June 03, 2024Complaint
Date: May 28, 2024Subpoena
Date: June 21, 2024Civil Summons
Date: May 28, 2024Extension Of Time
Date: June 10, 2024Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2024Order to Extend Time
Date: June 10, 2024Summons - Return of Service
Date: June 06, 2024Notice of Appearance
Date: June 10, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Extension Of Time | |
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Order to Extend Time | |
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons - Return of Service | |
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Amend | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Summons | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.