Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Van Duyn, Stephen, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Kingston, Don, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
April 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.