Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Vanina, Robert C, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Smith, Kerry Catherine, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2024 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 05/21/2024 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse continued pursuant to party's motion to 09/06/2024 at 09:00AM in Department C-61. | |
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Vanina, Robert C. | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 . | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse was rescheduled to 05/21/2024 at 09:00:00 AM in C-61 before at Central. | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Vanina, Robert C. Refers to: Smith, Kerry | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Vanina, Robert C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.