Crp T H C Mission Gorge West I Owners Llc,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
represented by
Mckinley, James Russell,
against
Alkandari, Yousef,
Almershed, Abdulaziz,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Charles E. Bell, Jr. presiding.
Case Details for
Crp T H C Mission Gorge West I Owners Llc v. Alkandari, Yousef
, et al.
Case Events for
Crp T H C Mission Gorge West I Owners Llc v. Alkandari, Yousef
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 13, 2024
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Demurrer/Motion to Strike (UD) heard 03/13/2024 01:30:00 PM.
March 11, 2024
Docket Event
Writ of Possession issued.
March 11, 2024
Docket Event
Judgment entered for CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC and against Alkandari, Yousef ;Almershed, Abdulaziz for a grand total of $ 0.00 .
March 11, 2024
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC. Refers to: Alkandari, Yousef; Almershed, Abdulaziz
February 26, 2024
Docket Event
Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC received but not filed on 02/26/2024.
February 26, 2024
Docket Event
The default filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC was entered as to Alkandari, Yousef; Almershed, Abdulaziz on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $35,000 . Override feature used.
February 26, 2024
Docket Event
Proof of Service by Mail filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC.
February 26, 2024
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC. Refers to: Alkandari, Yousef; Almershed, Abdulaziz
February 26, 2024
Docket Event
Verification By Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance (UD-120) filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC.
February 16, 2024
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by CRP/ T H C MISSION GORGE WEST I OWNERS LLC. Refers to: Almershed, Abdulaziz