Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cruz, Olga, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Chavez, Esmeralda, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2024 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/27/2024 09:00:00 AM. | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Court ordered the dismissed prejudice. | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Chavez, Esmeralda. | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Chavez, Esmeralda. | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodgment (USB provided) filed by Chavez, Esmeralda. | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service filed by Cruz, Olga. Refers to: Chavez, Esmeralda; Paradis, Juliette; Paradis, Kingston | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/06/2024 09:00:00 AM. | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Cruz, Olga. Refers to: Chavez, Esmeralda; Paradis, Juliette; Paradis, Kingston | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The was continued to at in Department . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.