Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Las Americas Premium Outlets Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Herzog, Jonathon J., against Keshvani, Sabrina, Keshvani, Shafin, The Pita Kitchen Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W Pollack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: The Pita Kitchen LLC
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 28]
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 19]
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-11-01T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 30]
Date: 2023-11-01T00:00:00Order Setting Aside - Other (DEFAULT AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 16]
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Las Americas Premium Outlets LLC. Refers to: The Pita Kitchen LLC
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 37]
Date: 2023-12-11T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Las Americas Premium Outlets LLC.
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Order Setting Aside - Other (default as to Pita Kitchen LLC) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Las Americas Premium Outlets LLC.
Date: 2023-10-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-12-11T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2023-10-02T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Las Americas Premium Outlets LLC.
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00Order Setting Aside - Other (default) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-12-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.