Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The Residences At Cota Vera Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cantarelli, Nathalia De Araujo, against Amenra, Nefertiti, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Verification By Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance (UD-120) filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Complaint filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Original Summons filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/06/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 06, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Amenra, Nefertiti.
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC. Refers to: Amenra, Nefertiti
Date: September 13, 2023Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: September 27, 2023Opposition - Other filed by The Residences at Cota Vera LLC.
Date: September 13, 2023Declaration - Other submitted by Amenra, Nefertiti received but not filed on 09/06/2023.
Date: September 06, 2023Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (stay lockout) filed by Amenra, Nefertiti.
Date: 2023-09-06T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Amenra, Nefertiti.
Date: 2023-09-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Stay Lockout) filed by Amenra, Nefertiti.
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/07/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 07, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (UD) heard 09/15/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: September 15, 2023Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (UD) published.
Date: September 14, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.