We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bigby, Donna ,
Murray, Deborah ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Goonan, Gregory P ,
against
Dbjs Inc; Dba : Tradegroup ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Filing Date
April 04, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 03, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Filing Court House
Superior
Defendants
Dbjs Inc; Dba : Tradegroup
Case Events for
Bigby, Donna v. Dbjs Inc; Dba : Tradegroup
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 09, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.
June 05, 2023
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bigby, Donna; Murray, Deborah.
Get Document
June 05, 2023
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Murray, Deborah .
June 05, 2023
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Bigby, Donna .
June 05, 2023
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to DBJS Inc.
April 04, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Murray, Deborah; Bigby, Donna. Refers to: DBJS Inc
Get Document
April 04, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
April 04, 2023
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Murray, Deborah; Bigby, Donna. Refers to: DBJS Inc
Get Document
April 04, 2023
Docket Event
Summons issued.
April 04, 2023
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Murray, Deborah; Bigby, Donna. Refers to: DBJS Inc
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.