Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Koster, Megan, against Rivera, Cindy, Rivera, Jazmin Serralde, Rivera, Oscar Jr, Serralde, Oscar, represented by Smith, Jefferson S, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer filed by Rivera, Cindy; Rivera, Jazmin Serralde; Serralde, Oscar.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino. Refers to: Rivera, Oscar
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Rivera, Cindy; Rivera, Jazmin Serralde; Rivera, Oscar Jr.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino. Refers to: Rivera, Cindy
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Rivera, Cindy; Rivera, Jazmin Serralde; Rivera, Oscar Jr.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino. Refers to: Rivera, Jazmin
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/15/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Galvan, Luis Fernando Yeverino.
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.