Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sampson, Diana, Sampson, Fernando, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Self-Represented, against Jones, Deborah K., Ra Snyder Properties Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/18/2023 09:15:00 AM.
Date: August 18, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by SAMPSON, DIANA.
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/21/2023 09:15:00 AM.
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: August 18, 2023Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by SAMPSON, FERNANDO.
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.