Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hays, Pamela, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Carlson, Kyle, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Mark T. Cumba presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Kyle Carson was granted. | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 11/03/2022 09:00:00 AM. | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-EAR or EAF) filed by Hays, Pamela. Refers to: Carlson, Kyle | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (GRANTED) filed by Carlson, Kyle. | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service filed by Hays, Pamela. Refers to: Carlson, Kyle | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Hays, Pamela. Refers to: Carlson, Kyle | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Hays, Pamela. Refers to: Carlson, Kyle | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Removal from Residence filed by Hays, Pamela. Refers to: Carlson, Kyle | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .
Judge: Mark T. Cumba |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department E-21.
Judge: Mark T. Cumba |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.