Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Aines, David, Aines, Deborah, Aines, Jason, Aines, Kimberly, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Bogard, Lane K, against G Kim Hembree As Trustee Of The Hembree Family Trust Dated March 09 2005, Hembree, G Kim, Hembree, H Mack, H Mack Hembree As Trustee Of The Hembree Family Trust Dated March 09 2005, represented by Inscore, Daniel Z, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Aines, Kimberly.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: April 15, 2024Opposition - Other (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) filed by Hembree, G Kim.
Date: June 06, 2024Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Aines, David; Aines, Deborah.
Date: 2024-02-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/10/2024 09:00:00 AM.
Date: May 10, 2024Substitution of Attorney filed by Aines, Jason.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 20]
Date: April 15, 2024Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: May 07, 2024Case reassigned from Judge Sturgeon, Eddie C to Joel Wohlfeil effective 04/10/2024
Date: 2024-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Aines, Jason; Aines, Kimberly; Aines, David; Aines, Deborah.
Date: 2024-04-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/06/2024 08:30:00 AM.
Date: June 06, 2024For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.