Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Phelps, Cheryl Ann filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kelety, Julia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Conservatee re: Your Rights filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from Kelety,Julia to Alvarez,Olga effective 04/01/2023 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care filed by Phelps, Cheryl Ann. | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Conservatee's Rights filed by Phelps, Cheryl Ann. | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters of Conservatorship - Person filed by Phelps, Cheryl Ann. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Petition for Appointment of Conservator(Amended Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person - Limited) filed by Cheryl Ann Phelps granted. Cheryl Ann Phelps and Drew Arthur Phelps appointed as Co-Limited Conservators for the Person of Riley Morgan Phelps. Letters to be issued. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Court releases Kimberly D. Neilson as Counsel for Riley Morgan Phelps. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Probate Conservator (Order Appointing Probate Conservator of the Person) filed by Phelps, Cheryl Ann. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Appointment of Limited Conservator heard 03/10/2022 10:30:00 AM. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Court updated role of Riley Morgan Phelps to Conservatee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.