Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Richard, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kelety, Julia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Fee Declaration (Declaration of Guardian Ad Litem Regarding Fees) filed by Cramer, Ellery.
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Other (Trusts) scheduled for 07/12/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing) filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Cramer, Kirby L.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Related Case) filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Ex Parte scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Case reassigned from Kelety,Julia to Alvarez,Olga effective 04/01/2023
Date: April 01, 2023Proof of Service filed by Cramer, Ellery.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: July 26, 2022Minutes finalized for Other (Trusts) heard 07/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Ex Parte scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Cramer, Kirby L.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/21/2022 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation - Other submitted by Richard, Elizabeth received but not filed on 03/04/2022.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Cramer, Kirby L.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Cramer, Ellery.
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Cramer, Kirby L.
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Richard, Elizabeth.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Other (Trusts) scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BROWN, JAMES J.
Date: July 29, 2022Notice of Entry of Order filed by BROWN, JAMES J.
Date: July 29, 2022Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/22/2022 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.