Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Homer, Sheila Joy, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Julia C. Kelety presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration - Other filed by HOMER, SHEILA Joy.
Date: March 02, 2022Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition heard 03/08/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: March 08, 2022Proof of Service by Mail filed by HOMER, SHEILA Joy.
Date: February 15, 2022Proposed Order submitted by HOMER, SHEILA Joy received but not filed on 03/02/2022.
Date: March 02, 2022Spousal Property Petition scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by HOMER, SHEILA Joy.
Date: December 29, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.