Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joachim, Charles L. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kelety, Julia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Supplement to Petition filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: August 09, 2022Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Surety Bond ($20,000) filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: February 10, 2022Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 02/10/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: February 10, 2022Order for Probate filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Case reassigned from Kelety,Julia to Alvarez,Olga effective 04/01/2023
Date: April 01, 2023Letters Testamentary (Letters Expire: 08/10/2023) filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: March 25, 2022Proposed Order submitted by Joachim, Charles L. received but not filed on 02/10/2022.
Date: February 10, 2022Self-Proving Will dated 05/01/2015 admitted to probate on 02/10/2022.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Joachim, Charles L..
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Petition for Probate scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.