Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chappell, Perneatha, Chappell, Renee, Lewis, Jacqueline, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Julia C. Kelety presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Petition for Probate scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Chappell, Heath. Refers to: Chappell, Gloria
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Statement - Other (Statement Regarding Knowledge of Creditors) filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Supplement to Petition (Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration) filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 02/10/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 05/05/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 21]
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Order for Probate filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/06/2022 11:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Case reassigned from Kelety,Julia to Alvarez,Olga effective 04/01/2023
Date: 2023-04-01T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Chappell, Sam Jr.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: July 17, 2023Surety Bond ($600,000) filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Other (Estates) scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: June 13, 2023Inventory and Appraisal - Final (TOTAL: $275,000.00) filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Order for Probate (and Bond) submitted by Hans, Jennifer rejected on 06/08/2022.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Chappell, Sam Jr.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Petition for Probate scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Chappell, Sam Jr.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Other (Estates) heard 02/28/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Letters of Administration (LETTERS EXPIRE: 12/06/2023) filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sale filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: July 17, 2023Proof of Service filed by Lewis, Jacqueline; Chappell, Perneatha; Chappell, Renee.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Chappell, Heath.
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal - Supplemental ($176,580.20) filed by Hans, Jennifer.
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Other (Estates) heard 07/24/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: July 24, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.