Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hall, Lavaughn filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kelety, Julia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from Kelety,Julia to Alvarez,Olga effective 04/01/2023 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship - Person filed by Hall, LaVaughn. | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian or Extending Guardianship of the Person filed by Hall, LaVaughn. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Court trial commenced. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Probate Court Trial heard 08/26/2022 09:00:00 AM. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) - Person Only filed by LaVaughn Hall granted. LaVaughn Hall appointed as Guardian for the Person of Jordan Demond Richardson-Hall . Letters to be issued. | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (LETTERS EXPIRE: 08/26/2022) filed by Hall, LaVaughn. | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of General Guardian continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/26/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Julia C. Kelety.
Judge: Julia C Kelety |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Appointment of General Guardian heard 03/23/2022 08:45:00 AM. | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Report filed by FAMILY COURT SERVICES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.