We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee Of Synchrony Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Keshavarz, Dean ,
against
Soderberg, Carolyn ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Filing Date
September 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Plaintiffs
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee Of Synchrony Bank
Case Events for
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee Of Synchrony Bank v. Soderberg, Carolyn
Date
Type
Description
March 18, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Get Document
July 30, 2022
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee of Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Soderberg, Carolyn
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee of Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Soderberg, Carolyn
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee of Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Soderberg, Carolyn
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Declaration - Other filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc Assignee of Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Soderberg, Carolyn
Get Document
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department C-61.
September 30, 2021
Docket Event
Summons issued.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.