Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Phan, Nicole, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Anthony J. Campagna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J. Campagna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Phan, Nicole received but not filed on 09/23/2021.
Date: September 23, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 23, 2021Petition for Change of Name filed by Phan, Nicole.
Date: September 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phan, Nicole.
Date: September 23, 2021Proof of Service by Publication filed by Phan, Nicole.
Date: October 26, 2021Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 11/08/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: November 08, 2021Decree Changing Name filed by Phan, Nicole.
Date: November 08, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Phan, Nicole.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.