Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yuan, Lanfeng, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John B Scherling presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[Another document for ROA# 8]
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Citation - Probate filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Guardian Ad Litem Report filed by Chung, Minh.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 48]
Date: 2022-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Unavailibility) filed by Chung, Minh.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Response to Examiner's Notes) filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Chung, Minh.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Response (In Response to Opposition and Objection Declaration of Petitioner) filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Yuan, Lanfeng received but not filed on 11/12/2021.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Ex Parte scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 John B Scherling.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Court Appointed Attorney Report filed by Chung, Minh.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Citation (Probate) and Proof of Service filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Interpreter Request (Mandarin; Hearing on 01/07/22) filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Citation - Probate filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Citation (Probate) and Proof of Service filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Chung, Christophe.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 78]
Date: August 24, 2022Order - Other (Stipulation and Order RE: Powers of Attorney and Petition) filed by Yuan, Lanfeng.
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 08/04/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Court Appointed Attorney Report filed by Chung, Minh.
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 08/25/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: August 25, 2022Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 03/17/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.