Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sabbas, Leon Brian, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Self-Represented, against Buncher, Martin Matthew, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 03/28/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.
Date: December 10, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: September 23, 2021Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/10/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: September 23, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: December 10, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.