Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Edwards, Alex T, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mcdonald, Cary, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Anthony J. Campagna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (and Proof of Electronic Service) filed by EDWARDS, ALEX T. Refers to: McDonald, Cary | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/27/2022 01:30:00 PM. | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | The Motion for Attorney Fees was DENIED . | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Brief - Other (REPLY BRIEF) filed by McDonald, Cary. | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTY FEES) filed by McDonald, Cary. | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (ATTORNEY JOEL BAILEY) filed by McDonald, Cary. | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees filed by McDonald, Cary. | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 1603 Robert Longstreth. | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/03/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to 1603 on 11/03/2021 at 09:00AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.