Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Zarate, Denice P, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Osuna, Karina ; Aka : Duarte, Karina, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/28/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed with prejudice. | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service filed by Zarate, Denice P. Refers to: Osuna, Karina | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (AMENDED) filed by Zarate, Denice P. Refers to: Osuna, Karina | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Zarate, Denice P. Refers to: Osuna, Karina | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Granted 100 yards) filed by Zarate, Denice P. Refers to: Osuna, Karina | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-03. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.