Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Van Den Heuvel, Mauri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gibbons, Neal, Shoar, Amir, against Malkami, Venos, represented by Haycraft, Kim, Palizzolo, Orlando, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with James A Mangione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames A Mangione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 14]
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri. Refers to: Malkami, Venos
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri. Refers to: Malkami, Venos
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Complaint filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri. Refers to: Malkami, Venos
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Stevan L Denenber) filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/30/2022 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Neal Gibbons) filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Malkami, Venos.
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of Order to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/10/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/15/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/25/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: May 31, 2023Substitution of Attorney filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: August 30, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Van Den Heuvel, Mauri.
Date: May 31, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.