Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pountney, Angelica Rivero, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Filippone, Stefano, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/22/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/22/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by POUNTNEY, ANGELICA RIVERO. | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 06/29/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/29/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 05/25/2021 09:00:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.