Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rios, Ashley, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Jackson, Jeffrey P; Larabee, Joel D; Velazquez Oatis, Brisa, Larabee, Joel D, against 247Postal Inc, represented by Green, Sabrina L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: January 10, 2023[A document for ROA# 3]
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: December 27, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Complaint filed by Rios, Ashley. Refers to: 247Postal Inc
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Ashley. Refers to: 247Postal Inc
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Rios, Ashley.
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: December 27, 2022Proof of Service of Order to be Relieved as Counsel filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Answer filed by 247Postal Inc.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.