Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marketsource Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brodkin, Alan L, against I3 Brands Inc; Esa : Partprotection Llc, Partprotection Llc, represented by Henderson, James D Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Application for Entry of Judgment filed by MARKETSOURCE INC.
Date: September 19, 2022Application for Entry of Judgment filed by MARKETSOURCE INC.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Original Summons filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: I3 Brands Inc
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by PARTPROTECTION LLC.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/29/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/08/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 08, 2022E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: February 06, 2023Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by MARKETSOURCE INC.
Date: September 01, 2022Case Management Statement filed by MARKETSOURCE INC.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: PARTPROTECTION LLC
Date: September 19, 2022Stipulated Judgment filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: I3 Brands Inc
Date: February 22, 2023Proposed Order submitted by MARKETSOURCE INC received but not filed on 09/01/2022.
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Complaint filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: I3 Brands Inc
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (first) filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: I3 Brands Inc; PARTPROTECTION LLC
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court (not entered) submitted by MARKETSOURCE INC rejected on 02/06/2023.
Date: February 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MARKETSOURCE INC. Refers to: I3 Brands Inc
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Answer filed by PARTPROTECTION LLC.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.