Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Punter, Adrienne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Golden, Jeremy S, against Challenge Financial Services Inc, Vantage Financial Network Inc; Dba : Challenge Financial Services Inc, represented by Elder, William N. Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer filed by Challenge Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Punter, Adrienne
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Punter, Adrienne. Refers to: Vantage Financial Network Inc
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Complaint filed by Punter, Adrienne. Refers to: Vantage Financial Network Inc
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: June 14, 2022Notice - Other filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/15/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Vantage Financial Network Inc.
Date: June 28, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Punter, Adrienne. Refers to: Vantage Financial Network Inc
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Punter, Adrienne. Refers to: Vantage Financial Network Inc
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Punter, Adrienne.
Date: October 03, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Challenge Financial Services Inc.
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.